Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luis de Salcedo y Azcona

Deceased

Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1667BornValladolid
30 Jan 171042.1SelectedBishop of Coria, Spain
22 May 171345.5ConfirmedBishop of Coria, Spain
20 Aug 171345.7Ordained BishopBishop of Coria, Spain
1 Jul 171648.6AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
7 Oct 172254.8AppointedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
3 May 174173.4DiedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

MicroData Summary for Luis de Salcedo y Azcona:
Archbishop Luis de Salcedo y Azcona (born , died ) Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}

  • a bishop for 27.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 152, and Page 166
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 222
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 28, Number 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 22 Jul 2014