Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquín Abarca Blaque

Deceased

Bishop of León


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1778BornHuesca
27 Jun 182446.1SelectedBishop of León, Spain
27 Sep 182446.3ConfirmedBishop of León, Spain
20 Mar 182546.8Ordained BishopBishop of León, Spain
21 Jun 184466.1DiedBishop of León, Spain

MicroData Summary for Joaquín Abarca Blaque:
Bishop Joaquín Abarca Blaque (born , died ) Bishop of León

  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,892
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 234
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 143, Number 772

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013