Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Keith Weigand

Bishop Emeritus of Sacramento, California, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1937 Born
25 May 196326.0Ordained PriestPriest of Boise City, Idaho, USA
3 Sep 198043.2AppointedBishop of Salt Lake City, Utah, USA
17 Nov 198043.4Ordained BishopBishop of Salt Lake City, Utah, USA
30 Nov 199356.5AppointedBishop of Sacramento, California, USA
27 Jan 199456.6InstalledBishop of Sacramento, California, USA
29 Nov 200871.5RetiredBishop of Sacramento, California, USA

MicroData Summary for William Keith Weigand
Bishop William Keith Weigand (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Sacramento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBend, OR

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sacramento.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Nov 2008
  • c1: CB, 26 May 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018