Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ambroise Kotamba Djoliba

Bishop Emeritus of Sokodé, Togo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1938 Born
11 Apr 196628.2Ordained PriestPriest of Sokodé, Togo
5 Apr 199355.2AppointedBishop of Sokodé, Togo
7 Aug 199355.5Ordained BishopBishop of Sokodé, Togo
3 Jan 201678.0RetiredBishop of Sokodé, Togo

MicroData Summary for Ambroise Kotamba Djoliba
Bishop Ambroise Kotamba Djoliba (born 1938) Bishop Emeritus of Sokodé

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSiou

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sokodé.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135, Number 12,124
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Jan 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast