Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Sokodé

Dioecesis Sokodensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 14 September 1955
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Lomé
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Togo
  • Square Kilometers: 12,610 (4,870 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, 300 B.P. 55, Sokode, Togo
  • Telephone: 2550.02.16

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Sokodé
18 May 1937ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Togo Prefecture Apostolic of Sokodé (erected)
Diocese of Sokodé
14 September 1955ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Sokodé Diocese of Sokodé
1 March 1960Territory LostDiocese of Sokodé Prefecture Apostolic of Dapango (erected)
1 July 1994Territory LostDiocese of Sokodé Diocese of Kara (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Sokodé
197041,263468,8138.8%1422361,146334315ap1971
198061,511592,82010.4%1024341,809365319ap1981
199084,198710,21011.9%2923521,6193710223ap1991
1999110,500810,20013.6%167234,804136711ap2000
2000113,564810,20014.0%165215,40796811ap2001
2001116,379810,20014.4%167235,059107111ap2002
2002118,624814,73414.6%177244,942127411ap2003
2003120,726815,00014.8%198274,471137711ap2004
2004122,857816,00015.1%248323,839127411ap2005
2010137,2131,033,72913.3%3517522,6382910315ap2011
2014153,0211,136,00013.5%4620662,3182910617ap2015

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_d, v3.0.9, 4 May 2015; Data: 3 Jun 2015