Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedict Takahiko Tomizawa

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sapporo, Japan

Prefect of Karafuto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1911Born
27 Mar 193726.1Ordained PriestPriest of Kyōto, Japan
11 Dec 195241.8AppointedBishop of Sapporo, Japan
30 Jan 195341.9AppointedPrefect of Karafuto, Russian Federation
19 Mar 195342.1Ordained BishopBishop of Sapporo, Japan
3 Oct 198776.6RetiredBishop of Sapporo, Japan
26 Mar 198978.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Sapporo, Japan

MicroData Summary for Benedict Takahiko Tomizawa
Bishop Benedict Takahiko Tomizawa (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sapporo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKyoto

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 36.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast