Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domingos de Pinho Brandão

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Porto

Titular Bishop of Filaca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1920BornRossas
24 Apr 194323.3Ordained PriestPriest
6 Dec 196646.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Leiria, Portugal
6 Dec 196646.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Filaca
29 Jan 196747.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Filaca
1 Jul 197252.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Porto, Portugal
22 Aug 198868.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Porto, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Domingos de Pinho Brandão:
Bishop Domingos de Pinho Brandão (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Porto

  • a priest for 45.3 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013