Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Oscar Jozef Joliet

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium

Titular Bishop of Constantia in Arabia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1878Born
20 Sep 190224.0Ordained PriestPriest of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
17 Apr 194869.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
17 Apr 194869.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Constantia in Arabia
29 Jun 194869.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Constantia in Arabia
3 Feb 196990.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Oscar Jozef Joliet
Bishop Oscar Jozef Joliet (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGand, Diocese of Gent {Ghent, Gand}
Ordained BishopSaint Bavo's, Cathedral, Gand, Diocese of Gent {Ghent, Gand}

  • a priest for 66.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,948, Number 77
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 692

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast