Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas F. Quinlan, S.S.C.M.E. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ch’unch’ŏn, Korea (South)

Titular Bishop of Bocconia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1896Born
2 Feb 192023.3Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Society of St. Columban
8 Dec 194044.2AppointedPrefect of Shunsen, Korea (South)
9 Feb 194245.4ResignedPrefect of Shunsen, Korea (South)
12 Nov 194852.1AppointedPrefect of Chunchon, Korea (South)
20 Sep 195559.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Furnos Maior
20 Sep 195559.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Chunchon, Korea (South)
23 Nov 195559.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Furnos Maior
10 Mar 196265.4AppointedBishop of Ch’unch’ŏn, Korea (South)
16 Nov 196569.1ResignedBishop of Ch’unch’ŏn, Korea (South)
16 Nov 196569.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Bocconia
31 Dec 197074.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Ch’unch’ŏn, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for Thomas F. Quinlan
Bishop Thomas F. Quinlan S.S.C.M.E. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ch’unch’ŏn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBorrisoleigh, Ireland

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 106
  • ab/r: CB, 27 Oct 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast