Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José María Arancibia

Archbishop Emeritus of Mendoza, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1937 Born
22 Sep 196225.4Ordained PriestPriest
26 Feb 198749.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Córdoba, Argentina
26 Feb 198749.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Pumentum
28 May 198750.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pumentum
13 Feb 199355.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Mendoza, Argentina
28 May 199356.1InstalledCoadjutor Archbishop of Mendoza, Argentina
25 Mar 199658.9SucceededArchbishop of Mendoza, Argentina
10 Nov 201275.5RetiredArchbishop of Mendoza, Argentina

MicroData Summary for José María Arancibia
Archbishop José María Arancibia (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Mendoza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires
Ordained BishopCathedral, Córdoba, Archdiocese of Córdoba

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Mendoza.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 10 Nov 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 104, Number 9,031

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 4 Jan 2021

Quantcast