Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Henry Speltz

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint Cloud, Minnesota, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1912Born
2 Jun 194028.0Ordained PriestPriest of Winona, Minnesota, USA
12 Feb 196350.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Winona, Minnesota, USA
12 Feb 196350.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Claneus
25 Mar 196350.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Claneus
4 Apr 196653.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Saint Cloud, Minnesota, USA
7 Jun 196654.0InstalledCoadjutor Bishop of Saint Cloud, Minnesota, USA
31 Jan 196855.6SucceededBishop of Saint Cloud, Minnesota, USA
13 Jan 198774.6RetiredBishop of Saint Cloud, Minnesota, USA
1 Feb 200491.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint Cloud, Minnesota, USA

MicroData Summary for George Henry Speltz
Bishop George Henry Speltz (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint Cloud

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAltura

  • a priest for 63.6 years
  • a bishop for 40.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast