Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis John Dunn

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Dubuque, Iowa, USA

Titular Bishop of Turris Tamalleni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1922Born
11 Jan 194825.8Ordained PriestPriest of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
1 Jun 196947.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
1 Jun 196947.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Turris Tamalleni
27 Aug 196947.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Turris Tamalleni
17 Nov 198967.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Dubuque, Iowa, USA

MicroData Summary for Francis John Dunn
Bishop Francis John Dunn (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Dubuque

EventPlace
Birth PlaceElkader, IA, Archdiocese of Dubuque, Iowa
Ordained PriestElkader, IA, Archdiocese of Dubuque, Iowa

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • c1: CB, 11 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast