Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Xaver Eberle

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Augsburg

Titular Bishop of Zaliche


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1874BornAugsburg
18 Jul 189723.0Ordained PriestPriest of Augsburg, Germany
2 Jun 193459.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Augsburg, Germany
2 Jun 193459.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Zaliche
25 Jul 193460.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zaliche
19 Nov 195177.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Augsburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Franz Xaver Eberle:
Bishop Franz Xaver Eberle (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Augsburg

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013