Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilhelm Sedlmeier

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Rottenburg, Germany

Titular Bishop of Aulon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1898Born
5 Apr 192425.9Ordained PriestPriest of Rottenburg, Germany
7 Feb 195354.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rottenburg, Germany
7 Feb 195354.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Aulon
25 Mar 195354.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aulon
19 Nov 197476.5RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Rottenburg, Germany
24 Feb 198788.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Rottenburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Wilhelm Sedlmeier
Bishop Wilhelm Sedlmeier (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Rottenburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFriedrichshafen

  • a priest for 62.8 years
  • a bishop for 33.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018