Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John McMullen

Deceased

Bishop of Davenport, Iowa, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1832Born
20 Jun 185826.4Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
14 Jun 188149.4AppointedBishop of Davenport, Iowa, USA
25 Jul 188149.5Ordained BishopBishop of Davenport, Iowa, USA
4 Jul 188351.4DiedBishop of Davenport, Iowa, USA

MicroData Summary for John McMullen
Bishop John McMullen (born , died ) Bishop of Davenport

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBallynahinch, Diocese of Dromore, Ireland
Ordained BishopChicago, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois

  • a priest for 25.0 years
  • a bishop for 1.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 240
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1881, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018