Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Janssen

Deceased

Bishop of Belleville, Illinois, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1835Born
19 Nov 185823.7Ordained PriestPriest of Alton, Illinois, USA
28 Feb 188852.9AppointedBishop of Belleville, Illinois, USA
25 Apr 188853.1Ordained BishopBishop of Belleville, Illinois, USA
2 Jul 191378.3DiedBishop of Belleville, Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for John Janssen
Bishop John Janssen (born , died ) Bishop of Belleville

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKeppeln, Diocese of Münster, Germany
Ordained BishopSt. Peter, Cathedral, Belleville, Diocese of Belleville, Illinois

  • a priest for 54.6 years
  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 144
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1888, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017