Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Springfield in Illinois

Dioecesis Campifontis in Illinois



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Thomas John Joseph Paprocki, Bishop
  • Daniel Leo Ryan, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 26 October 1923
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Chicago
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Illinois
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 39,195 (15,139 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: VII (IL, IN, WI)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: SFD
  • Official Web Site: http://www.dio.org/
  • Mailing Address: Chancery Office, P.O. Box 3187, 1615 W. Washington St., Springfield, IL 62708-3187
  • Telephone: (217)698-8500
  • Fax: 698-0802

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Quincy
29 July 1853ErectedDiocese of Chicago Diocese of Quincy (erected)
Diocese of Alton
9 January 1857Name ChangedDiocese of Quincy Diocese of Alton
7 January 1887Territory LostDiocese of Alton Diocese of Belleville (erected)
Diocese of Springfield in Illinois
26 October 1923Name ChangedDiocese of Alton Diocese of Springfield in Illinois

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Springfield in Illinois
1950110,303934,97511.8%2281243523131981,145176ap1951
1966176,9491,043,22417.0%2421313734742161,236183ap1967
1970187,2491,043,22417.9%198942926411551,082144ap1971
1976182,7581,091,19116.7%16587252725133984181ap1977
1980184,0231,123,00016.4%16892260707156988180ap1981
1990178,1081,224,00014.6%14676222802104824172ap1991
1999163,7131,106,12414.8%14562207790219700165ap2000
2000169,7691,129,81415.0%132661988572101611164ap2001
2001175,4741,142,63015.4%107621691,0384117830164ap2002
2002169,7351,142,63014.9%108631719927110503162ap2003
2003177,9731,142,63015.6%12956185962499666160ap2004
2004161,3251,106,12414.6%11959178906590563156ap2005
2009164,0001,176,00013.9%105521571,0442394567131ap2010
2010165,5481,187,10013.9%104531571,0543695525131ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 19 Aug 2014