Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexander Joseph McGavick

Deceased

Bishop of La Crosse, Wisconsin, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1863Born
11 Jun 188723.8Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
12 Dec 189835.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
12 Dec 189835.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Marcopolis
1 May 189935.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Marcopolis
21 Nov 192158.2AppointedBishop of La Crosse, Wisconsin, USA
25 Aug 194885.0DiedBishop of La Crosse, Wisconsin, USA

MicroData Summary for Alexander Joseph McGavick
Bishop Alexander Joseph McGavick (born , died ) Bishop of La Crosse

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFox Lake, IL
Ordained BishopHoly Name, Cathedral, Chicago, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois
Death PlaceLa Crosse, Diocese of La Crosse, Wisconsin

  • a priest for 61.2 years
  • a bishop for 49.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 366
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1899, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast