Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Mbali

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Buta, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1921Born
20 Dec 194726.9Ordained PriestPriest of Buta, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
4 Jul 196140.5AppointedBishop of Buta, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
12 Nov 196140.8Ordained BishopBishop of Buta, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
27 Sep 199675.7RetiredBishop of Buta, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
22 Jun 200786.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Buta, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Jacques Mbali
Bishop Jacques Mbali (born 1921, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Buta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAketi

  • a priest for 59.5 years
  • a bishop for 45.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast