Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuel Marcel Mbikanye, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bondo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Sep 1916Born
8 Dec 194428.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
1 Sep 197054.0AppointedBishop of Bondo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
7 Mar 197154.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bondo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
20 Sep 197862.0DiedBishop of Bondo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel Marcel Mbikanye
Bishop Emmanuel Marcel Mbikanye O.P. (born Sep 1916, died ) Bishop of Bondo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmadi
Ordained BishopBondo, Diocese of Bondo

  • a priest for 33.7 years
  • a bishop for 7.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,102

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast