Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alphonse-Marie Runiga Musanganya

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mahagi-Nioka, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Dec 1924Born
2 Apr 195631.3Ordained PriestPriest
3 May 197954.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kisangani, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
3 May 197954.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Gigthi
16 Sep 197954.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gigthi
4 Sep 198055.7AppointedBishop of Mahagi-Nioka, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
16 Oct 200176.8RetiredBishop of Mahagi-Nioka, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
11 Aug 200681.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Mahagi-Nioka, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Alphonse-Marie Runiga Musanganya
Bishop Alphonse-Marie Runiga Musanganya (born Dec 1924, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mahagi-Nioka

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBushumba

  • a priest for 50.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast