Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Mbwôl-Mpasi, O.M.I.

Bishop Emeritus of Idiofa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1931 Born
26 Jan 196230.9Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
4 Jun 198453.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Isangi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
4 Jun 198453.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Carcabia
25 Nov 198453.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carcabia
1 Sep 198857.5AppointedBishop of Isangi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
20 May 199766.2AppointedBishop of Idiofa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
31 May 200675.3RetiredBishop of Idiofa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Louis Mbwôl-Mpasi
Bishop Louis Mbwôl-Mpasi O.M.I. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Idiofa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIpamu

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Idiofa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 31 May 2006

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast