Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Bondo

Dioecesis Bondoensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 10 November 1959
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Kisangani
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Congo, The Democratic Republic of
  • Square Kilometers: 75,600 (29,200 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, B.P. 21, Bondo, Uele o c/o B.P. 505, Eveche de Kisangani, Rep. Democratique du Congo

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Bondo
10 March 1926ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Western Uélé {Uélé Occidental} Prefecture Apostolic of Bondo (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Bondo
2 December 1937ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Bondo Vicariate Apostolic of Bondo
Diocese of Bondo
10 November 1959ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Bondo Diocese of Bondo

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Bondo
195028,495182,00015.7%3363973022ap1951
Diocese of Bondo
195843,453171,00025.4%1146577622252ap1960
197079,257238,14533.3%1214263,0481202111ap1971
198086,500183,69847.1%1316292,982232411ap1981
199092,865207,85644.7%1013234,037162911ap1991
199773,527235,32631.2%187252,941112111ap2000
200062,166198,96531.2%186242,59081612ap2001
200162,166198,96531.2%186242,59081612ap2002
2002110,526200,36955.2%276333,3497179ap2003
200385,717392,20921.9%206263,29671711ap2004
200482,017395,37020.7%156213,90571811ap2005
2006136,007418,00032.5%155206,80061814ap2007
2012197,000422,00046.7%195248,20862214ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 9 Sep 2013