Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregory Lawrence Parkes

Bishop of Saint Petersburg, Florida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1964 BornMineola, NY
26 Jun 199935.2Ordained PriestPriest of Orlando, Florida, USA
20 Mar 201247.9AppointedBishop of Pensacola-Tallahassee, Florida, USA
5 Jun 201248.1Ordained BishopBishop of Pensacola-Tallahassee, Florida, USA
28 Nov 201652.6AppointedBishop of Saint Petersburg, Florida, USA
4 Jan 201752.7InstalledBishop of Saint Petersburg, Florida, USA

MicroData Summary for Gregory Lawrence Parkes
Bishop Gregory Lawrence Parkes (born ) Bishop of Saint Petersburg

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Saint Petersburg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Mar 2012
  • ob/c1: CB, 20 Mar 2012
  • c2+: CB, 11 May 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,442
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Nov 2016
  • i: CB, 28 Nov 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 29 Nov 2016