Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas James Olmsted

Bishop of Phoenix, Arizona, USA

Apostolic Administrator of Holy Protection of Mary of Phoenix (Ruthenian), Arizona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1947 Born
2 Jul 197326.4Ordained PriestPriest of Lincoln, Nebraska, USA
16 Feb 199952.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Wichita, Kansas, USA
20 Apr 199952.2Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Wichita, Kansas, USA
4 Oct 200154.7SucceededBishop of Wichita, Kansas, USA
25 Nov 200356.8AppointedBishop of Phoenix, Arizona, USA
20 Dec 200356.9InstalledBishop of Phoenix, Arizona, USA
3 Jan 200860.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Gallup, New Mexico, USA
5 Feb 200962.0CeasedApostolic Administrator of Gallup, New Mexico, USA
1 Aug 201871.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Holy Protection of Mary of Phoenix (Ruthenian), Arizona, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas James Olmsted
Bishop Thomas James Olmsted (born ) Bishop of Phoenix

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarysville, KS, Archdiocese of Kansas City in Kansas
Ordained BishopCentury II Convention Hall, Wichita, Diocese of Wichita, Kansas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Phoenix.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Number 13,502
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Aug 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast