Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Enrique Esteban Delgado

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Miami, Florida, USA

Titular Bishop of Aquae Novae in Proconsulari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1955 Born
29 Jun 199640.5Ordained PriestPriest of Miami, Florida, USA
12 Oct 201761.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Miami, Florida, USA
12 Oct 201761.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Novae in Proconsulari
7 Dec 201761.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae Novae in Proconsulari

MicroData Summary for Enrique Esteban Delgado
Father Enrique Esteban Delgado (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Miami

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima, Archdiocese of Lima, Peru
Ordained BishopSt. Mary, Cathedral, Miami, Archdiocese of Miami, Florida

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Miami.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Oct 2017
  • ob/c2: CB, 12 Oct 2017
  • c1: CB, 12 Oct 2017
  • mn: CB, 16 Oct 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 16 Oct 2017