Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Brewer

Deceased

Bishop of Lancaster, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1929BornBurnage
8 Jul 195626.6Ordained PriestPriest of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain
31 May 197141.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain
31 May 197141.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Britonia
28 Jul 197141.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Britonia
17 Nov 198354.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Lancaster, England, Great Britain
22 May 198555.5SucceededBishop of Lancaster, England, Great Britain
10 Jun 200070.5DiedBishop of Lancaster, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Brewer:
Bishop John Brewer (born , died ) Bishop of Lancaster

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 28.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,927
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 11 Nov 2014