Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Frederick Hall, M.H.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kisumu, Kenya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1902Born
21 Jul 192926.6Ordained PriestPriest of St. Joseph’s Missionary Society of Mill Hill
9 Apr 194845.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kisumu, Kenya
9 Apr 194845.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Alba Maritima
20 Jun 194845.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alba Maritima
25 Mar 195350.3AppointedBishop of Kisumu, Kenya
2 Dec 196361.0ResignedBishop of Kisumu, Kenya
2 Dec 196361.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Castra Nova
27 Jul 197673.6ResignedTitular Bishop of Castra Nova
18 Sep 198885.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Kisumu, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Frederick Hall
Bishop Frederick Hall M.H.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kisumu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBurnley, Lancashire, Diocese of Salford, England, Great Britain
Death PlaceHerbert House, Formby, Archdiocese of Liverpool, England, Great Britain

  • a priest for 59.1 years
  • a bishop for 40.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 64
  • loc: CL, 23 Sep 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 26 Sep 2018

Quantcast