Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Eric Grasar

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Shrewsbury, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1913BornScunthorpe
18 Dec 193724.6Ordained PriestPriest
26 Apr 196248.9AppointedBishop of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain
27 Jun 196249.1Ordained BishopBishop of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain
20 Mar 198066.8ResignedBishop of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain
28 Dec 198269.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William Eric Grasar:
Bishop William Eric Grasar (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Shrewsbury

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 87
  • bd: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1982, Page 548
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 107

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 11 Nov 2014