Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Joseph McGuinness

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nottingham, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1925Born
3 Jun 195024.6Ordained PriestPriest of Nottingham, England, Great Britain
2 Feb 197246.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Nottingham, England, Great Britain
2 Feb 197246.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Sanctus Germanus
23 Mar 197246.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sanctus Germanus
31 Oct 197449.0SucceededBishop of Nottingham, England, Great Britain
7 Nov 200075.0RetiredBishop of Nottingham, England, Great Britain
6 Apr 200781.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Nottingham, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for James Joseph McGuinness
Bishop James Joseph McGuinness (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nottingham

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLondonderry, County Derry, Diocese of Derry, Ireland
Ordained PriestSt. Barnabas, Cathedral, Nottingham, Nottinghamshire, Diocese of Nottingham, England
Ordained BishopSt. Barnabas, Cathedral, Nottingham, Nottinghamshire, Diocese of Nottingham, England
Death PlaceSt. Mary, Nursing Home, Ednaston, Ashbourne, Derbyshire, Diocese of Nottingham, England
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, St. Barnabas, Cathedral, Nottingham, Nottinghamshire, Diocese of Nottingham, England

  • a priest for 56.8 years
  • a bishop for 35.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast