Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Ambrose Watterson

Deceased

Bishop of Columbus, Ohio, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1844Born
9 Aug 186824.2Ordained PriestPriest of Columbus, Ohio, USA
6 Apr 188035.8AppointedBishop of Columbus, Ohio, USA
8 Aug 188036.1Ordained BishopBishop of Columbus, Ohio, USA
17 Apr 189954.8DiedBishop of Columbus, Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for John Ambrose Watterson
Bishop John Ambrose Watterson (born , died ) Bishop of Columbus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBairdstown, Diocese of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania
Ordained BishopSt. Joseph, Cathedral, Columbus, Diocese of Columbus, Ohio

  • a priest for 30.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 216
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1880, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Apr 2017