Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William O’Hara

Deceased

Bishop of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1816Born
21 Dec 184226.6Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
3 Mar 186851.8AppointedBishop of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA
12 Jul 186852.2Ordained BishopBishop of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA
3 Feb 189982.8DiedBishop of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for William O’Hara
Bishop William O’Hara (born , died ) Bishop of Scranton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDungiven, Ireland
Ordained BishopCathedral, Philadelphia, Diocese of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania

  • a priest for 56.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 505
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1868, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Feb 2017