Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominic Manucy

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Brownsville, Texas, USA

Titular Bishop of Maronea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1823Born
15 Aug 185026.6Ordained PriestPriest of Mobile, Alabama, USA
18 Sep 187450.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Brownsville, Texas, USA
18 Sep 187450.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Dulma
8 Dec 187450.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dulma
18 Jan 188460.0AppointedBishop of Mobile, Alabama, USA
30 Mar 188460.2InstalledBishop of Mobile, Alabama, USA
27 Sep 188460.7ResignedBishop of Mobile, Alabama, USA
7 Feb 188561.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Brownsville, Texas, USA
10 Feb 188561.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Maronea
4 Dec 188561.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Brownsville, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for Dominic Manucy
Bishop Dominic Manucy (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Brownsville

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint Augustine, FL
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Mobile, Diocese of Mobile, Alabama

  • a priest for 35.3 years
  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 253, and Page 369
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 388
  • c1: CB, 26 Feb 2015
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1874, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017