Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Baptist Höcht

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany

Titular Bishop of Miletopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1870Born
28 Oct 189828.1Ordained PriestPriest of Regensburg, Germany
14 Mar 193665.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany
14 Mar 193665.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Miletopolis
3 May 193665.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Miletopolis
4 Dec 195080.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johannes Baptist Höcht
Bishop Johannes Baptist Höcht (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Regensburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKrummennaab
Ordained BishopCathedral, Regensburg, Diocese of Regensburg

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,936, Number 29
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 23, Number 1,332

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast