Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Johannes Baptist Dietz

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fulda, Germany

Titular Archbishop of Cotrada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1879Born
28 Oct 190526.7Ordained PriestPriest of Bamberg, Germany
25 Jul 193657.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Fulda, Germany
25 Jul 193657.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Ionopolis
27 Sep 193657.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ionopolis
10 Apr 193960.1SucceededBishop of Fulda, Germany
2 Oct 195879.6RetiredBishop of Fulda, Germany
2 Oct 195879.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cotrada
11 Dec 195980.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Fulda, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johannes Baptist Dietz
Archbishop Johannes Baptist Dietz (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Fulda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBirkach

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 24 Sep 2018

Quantcast