Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Joseph Mullins

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Menevia, Wales, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1929Born
12 Apr 195323.7Ordained PriestPriest of Cardiff, Wales, Great Britain
5 Feb 197040.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cardiff, Wales, Great Britain
5 Feb 197040.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Sidnacestre
1 Apr 197040.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sidnacestre
12 Feb 198757.5AppointedBishop of Menevia, Wales, Great Britain
12 Jun 200171.9ResignedBishop of Menevia, Wales, Great Britain
1 Nov 201990.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Menevia, Wales, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Daniel Joseph Mullins (VIAF: 78284358)
Bishop Daniel Joseph Mullins (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Menevia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKilfinane, County Limerick, Diocese of Limerick, Ireland
Ordained PriestOscott, College, Sutton Coldfield, Warwickshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Ordained BishopSt. David, Cathedral, Cardiff, Glamorgan, Archdiocese of Cardiff, Wales
Death PlaceWaungron Mansion Care Home, Whitland, Carmarthenshire, Diocese of Menevia, Wales
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, St. Joseph’s, Cathedral, Swansea, West Glamorgan, Diocese of Menevia, Wales

  • a priest for 66.5 years
  • a bishop for 49.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 562
  • d: CB, 6 Nov 2019
  • loc: CL, 6 Nov 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast