Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georges-Hilaire Dupont, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pala, Chad


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1919Born
9 May 194323.4Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
16 Jan 196444.1AppointedBishop of Pala, Chad
1 May 196444.4Ordained BishopBishop of Pala, Chad
28 Jun 197555.6ResignedBishop of Pala, Chad
29 Jan 2020100.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Pala, Chad

MicroData Summary for Georges-Hilaire Dupont
Bishop Georges-Hilaire Dupont O.M.I. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVirey, France
Death PlaceSaint-Hilaire-du-Harcouët, France

  • a priest for 76.7 years
  • a bishop for 55.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • d: CB, 31 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast