Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Czeslaw Domin

Deceased

Bishop of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1929BornSiemianowice-Michalkowice
28 Jun 195324.0Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jun 197040.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Katowice, Poland
6 Jun 197040.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Dagnum
15 Aug 197041.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dagnum
1 Feb 199262.6AppointedBishop of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg, Poland
15 Mar 199666.7DiedBishop of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg, Poland

MicroData Summary for Czeslaw Domin:
Bishop Czeslaw Domin (born , died ) Bishop of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg

  • a priest for 42.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013