Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miklós Dudás, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Hajdúdorog (Hungarian), Hungary

Apostolic Administrator of Miskolc (Hungarian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1902Born
14 Oct 192219.9ProfessedMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
18 Oct 192522.9Solemn VowsMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
8 Sep 192724.8Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
25 Apr 193936.4AppointedBishop of Hajdúdorog (Hungarian), Hungary
14 May 193936.5Ordained BishopBishop of Hajdúdorog (Hungarian), Hungary
1 Jan 194441.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
Oct 1944²41.9CeasedApostolic Administrator of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
1946²43.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Miskolc (Hungarian), Hungary
15 Jul 197269.7DiedBishop of Hajdúdorog (Hungarian), Hungary

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Miklós Dudás (VIAF: 252026049)
Bishop Miklós Dudás O.S.B.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Hajdúdorog

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMáriapócs, Diocese of Hajdúdorog (Hungarian)
Ordained BishopShrine, Máriapócs, Diocese of Hajdúdorog (Hungarian)

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 33.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: JPG
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1939, Number 25
  • prof: CB, 25 Feb 2015
  • c1: CB, 8 Jun 2016
  • ob.loc: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 70, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast