Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Irynej Bilyk, O.S.B.M.

Bishop Emeritus of Buchach {Bučač} (Ukrainian), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1950 Born
Oct 196717.7ProfessedMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
13 Oct 197828.7Solemn VowsMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
14 Oct 197828.7Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
15 Aug 198939.6Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian), Ukraine
16 Jan 199141.0ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian), Ukraine
16 Jan 199141.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Novae
21 Jul 200050.5AppointedBishop of Buchach {Bučač} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
28 Jul 200757.5ResignedBishop of Buchach {Bučač} (Ukrainian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Irynej Bilyk
Bishop Irynej Bilyk O.S.B.M. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Buchach {Bučač}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKniazhpil

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Buchach {Bučač} (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Jul 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123, Number 11,057
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,269
  • c1: CB, 16 May 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast