Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ivan Marghitych

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian)

Titular Bishop of Scopelus in Haemimonto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1921BornBoržavske
18 Aug 194625.5Ordained PriestPriest of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
10 Sep 198766.6Ordained BishopBishop
16 Jan 199169.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
16 Jan 199169.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Scopelus in Haemimonto
12 Nov 200281.8RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
7 Sep 200382.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Ivan Marghitych:
Bishop Ivan Marghitych (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Mukachevo (Munkács)

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/op/c1: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,953
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,268
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 17 May 2014