Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Yakiv Yaroslav Tymchuk, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1919BornDuplyska, Ukraine
31 Mar 193616.6ProfessedMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
27 Sep 194223.0Solemn ProfessedMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
27 Dec 194223.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
3 Jan 194323.3Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
1977²57.3Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian), Ukraine
20 Dec 198869.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Yakiv Yaroslav Tymchuk
Bishop Yakiv Yaroslav Tymchuk O.S.B.M. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów]

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 27 May 2015
  • obd: CB, 29 May 2015
  • bp: CB, 4 Jun 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 25 Nov 2016