Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthias König

Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn

Titular Bishop of Elicroca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1959 BornDortmund
25 May 198525.6Ordained PriestPriest of Paderborn, Germany
14 Oct 200444.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
14 Oct 200444.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Elicroca
5 Dec 200445.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Elicroca

MicroData Summary for Matthias König:
Bishop Matthias König (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Paderborn.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Number 14,722

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013