Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josef Homeyer

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Hildesheim, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1929Born
11 Feb 195828.5Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
25 Aug 198354.0AppointedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
13 Nov 198354.2Ordained BishopBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
20 Aug 200475.0RetiredBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
30 Mar 201080.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Hildesheim, Germany

MicroData Summary for Josef Homeyer
Bishop Josef Homeyer (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Hildesheim

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHarsewinkel

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 26.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast