Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wolfgang Große (Grosse)

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Essen, Germany

Titular Bishop of Lamasba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1928Born
6 Aug 195224.2Ordained PriestPriest of Paderborn, Germany
23 Feb 195728.8IncardinatedPriest of Essen, Germany
12 Oct 196840.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Essen, Germany
12 Oct 196840.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Lamasba
8 Dec 196840.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lamasba
24 Feb 199162.8ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Essen, Germany
15 Feb 200172.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Essen, Germany

MicroData Summary for Wolfgang Große (Grosse)
Bishop Wolfgang Große (Grosse) (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Essen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDortmund

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 32.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast