Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinz Josef Algermissen

Bishop of Fulda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1943 BornHermeskeil
19 Jul 196926.4Ordained PriestPriest of Paderborn, Germany
23 Jul 199653.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
23 Jul 199653.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Labicum
21 Sep 199653.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Labicum
20 Jun 200158.3AppointedBishop of Fulda, Germany
23 Sep 200158.6InstalledBishop of Fulda, Germany

MicroData Summary for Heinz Josef Algermissen:
Bishop Heinz Josef Algermissen (born ) Bishop of Fulda

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Fulda.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,847
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 12 Feb 2014