Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Angelo Cardinal Dell’Acqua

Deceased

Vicar General of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Ambrogio e Carlo

Apostolic Administrator of Ostia

Archpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1903Born
9 May 192824.4Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
17 Feb 195349.1AppointedSubstitute (Sostituto) of the Secretariat of State
14 Dec 195855.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Chalcedon
27 Dec 195855.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Chalcedon
26 Jun 196763.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Ambrogio e Carlo
26 Jun 196763.5Elevated to Cardinal
23 Sep 196763.7AppointedPresident of the Prefecture for the Economic Affairs of the Holy See
13 Jan 196864.0AppointedVicar General of Roma {Rome}, Italy
13 Jan 196864.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ostia, Italy
7 Nov 197066.9AppointedArchpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}
27 Aug 197268.7DiedVicar General of Roma {Rome}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Dell’Acqua
(VIAF: 268719; WikiData: Q535834)
Angelo Cardinal Dell’Acqua (born , died ) Vicar General of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained PriestSan Bernardino, Church, Sesto Calende, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceLourdes, Diocese of Tarbes et Lourdes, France
Buried Place (Original)Family Tomb, Cemetery, Sesto Calende, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Buried Place (Current)San Bernardino, Church, Sesto Calende, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 44.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.6 years
  • a cardinal for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • xsta: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 36
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 558, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14, Number 722, Ascendance
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1958, Number 101
  • loc: AM, 1 Apr 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.6, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 17 Jun 2024