Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Savino

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Napoli {Naples}

Titular Bishop of Caesarea in Thessalia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1894BornNapoli
14 Aug 192127.4Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
194146.8AppointedPresident of Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy, Roman Curia
27 Apr 195965.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
27 Apr 195965.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesarea in Thessalia
21 Jun 195965.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caesarea in Thessalia
1967²72.8RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
27 Oct 198086.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Savino:
Bishop Paolo Savino (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 59.2 years
  • a bishop for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013