Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roman Danylak

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Toronto (Ukrainian), Canada

Titular Bishop of Nyssa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1930Born
13 Oct 195726.7Ordained PriestPriest of Winnipeg (Ukrainian), Manitoba, Canada
16 Dec 199261.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Toronto (Ukrainian), Canada
16 Dec 199261.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Nyssa
25 Mar 199362.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nyssa
16 Jun 199867.4ResignedApostolic Administrator of Toronto (Ukrainian), Canada
7 Oct 201281.7DiedApostolic Administrator Emeritus of Toronto (Ukrainian), Canada

MicroData Summary for Roman Danylak
Bishop Roman Danylak (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Toronto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceToronto

  • a priest for 54.9 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,062
  • ab/d: CB, 9 Oct 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)
  • opd/c1: CB, 6 Feb 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018