Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Neil Edward Tiedemann, C.P.

Auxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn, New York

Titular Bishop of Cova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1948 BornBrooklyn, NY, USA
22 Aug 197123.4ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Passion
22 Aug 197426.4Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Congregation of the Passion
16 May 197527.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
20 May 200860.2AppointedBishop of Mandeville, Jamaica, Antilles
6 Aug 200860.4Ordained BishopBishop of Mandeville, Jamaica, Antilles
29 Apr 201668.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA
29 Apr 201668.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Cova

MicroData Summary for Neil Edward Tiedemann
Bishop Neil Edward Tiedemann C.P. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Brooklyn.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 May 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,942
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Apr 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 29 Apr 2016